MI SB0037 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; reference to crime of administering drugs to procure miscarriage; remove to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 16a, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0039'23
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; reference to crime of administering drugs to procure miscarriage; remove to reflect repeal. Amends sec. 16a, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0039'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 40 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-08 | House | Received On 03/08/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 40 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rosemary Bayer |
Same As/Similar To
SB0039 (Same As) 2023-03-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary