MI SB0021 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0015'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Pa 0015'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; other; crime victims fund; ensure funds may be provided to minor victims of crime and require certain reporting. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).
Title
Crime victims; other; crime victims fund; ensure funds may be provided to minor victims of crime and require certain reporting. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 61 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 17 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 17 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0015'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/31/2017 @ 10:26 Am |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/30/2017 @ 10:47 Am |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/21/2017 @ 1:12 Pm |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 61 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-02-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-02 | House | Received On 02/02/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 17 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |