MI SB0019 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; disorderly conduct; penalties for disrupting a religious service; increase. Amends sec. 169 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.169).
Title
Crimes; disorderly conduct; penalties for disrupting a religious service; increase. Amends sec. 169 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.169).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-09 | House | Received On 02/09/2011 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 11 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-01-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-01-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |