MI SB0002 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Pa 0007'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523) & adds sec. 7521a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends sec. 7523 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7523) & adds sec. 7521a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 42 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAssigned Pa 0007'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-05-14SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 5/9/2019 @ 1:16 Pm
2019-05-14SenateApproved By Governor 5/9/2019 @ 11:53 Am
2019-05-01SenatePresented To Governor 4/30/2019 @ 10:32 Am
2019-04-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-25SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2019-04-25SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-04-25Senate Roll Call # 42 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-25SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2019-04-24HouseReturned To Senate
2019-04-24HouseTitle Amended
2019-04-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 107 Nays 3
2019-04-24HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-23HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2019-04-23HouseRead A Second Time
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-02-13HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-02-13HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-13HouseReceived On 02/13/2019
2019-02-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 5 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-02-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-02-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-01-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-01-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-01-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0002
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0002.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0002.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0002.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0002.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0007.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-01-29-009.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-02-13-014.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-26-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-24-038.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-25-039.htm

Bill Comments

feedback