MI HR0072 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to declare May 2, 2019, as Holocaust Remembrance Day in the state of Michigan.
Title
A resolution to declare May 2, 2019, as Holocaust Remembrance Day in the state of Michigan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |