MI HJRF | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Printed Joint Resolution Filed 01/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Printed Joint Resolution Filed 01/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendments; state; equal amount of per pupil funding for all local school districts; ensure by certain date. Amends sec. 11, art. IX of the state constitution.
Title
Constitutional amendments; state; equal amount of per pupil funding for all local school districts; ensure by certain date. Amends sec. 11, art. IX of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Printed Joint Resolution Filed 01/28/2015 |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |
Same As/Similar To
SJRD (Same As) 2015-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HJR-F |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/jointresolutionintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIJR-F.htm |