MI HJRC | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; warrants; search and seizure protections; expand to include electronic communications and seizures. Amends sec. 11, art. I of the state constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; warrants; search and seizure protections; expand to include electronic communications and seizures. Amends sec. 11, art. I of the state constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 100 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2017-05-17HouseTransmitted
2017-05-17House Roll Call # 100 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2017-05-17HouseAdopted By 2/3 Vote
2017-05-17HouseRead A Third Time
2017-05-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-05-04HouseRead A Second Time
2017-04-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-04-25HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-03-21HouseRecommendation Concurred In
2017-03-21HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary
2017-02-01HouseJoint Resolution Electronically Reproduced 01/31/2017
2017-01-31HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-01-31HouseRead A First Time
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback