MI HB6379 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Assigned Pa 357'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Retirement; state employees; retired legislative employee employed for a special assignment; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; state employees; retired legislative employee employed for a special assignment; allow without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 630 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 594 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 604 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27HouseAssigned Pa 357'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-11-27HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/20/2018 @ 11:24 Am
2018-11-27HouseApproved By The Governor 11/20/2018 @ 10:33 Am
2018-11-27HousePresented To The Governor 11/15/2018 @ 2:08 Pm
2018-11-08HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-11-08HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-11-08House Roll Call # 630 Yeas 106 Nays 2
2018-11-08HouseSenate Substitute S-2 Concurred In
2018-11-08HouseRule Suspended
2018-11-08HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-11-08HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-11-08SenateInserted Full Title
2018-11-08SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 594 Yeas 33 Nays 1 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-11-08SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-11-08SenateRules Suspended
2018-11-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2018-11-08SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2018-11-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2018-11-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-10-03HouseTransmitted
2018-10-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 604 Yeas 103 Nays 4
2018-10-03HouseRead A Third Time
2018-10-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-10-02HouseRead A Second Time
2018-09-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-09-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-09-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/25/2018
2018-09-25HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2018-09-25HouseRead A First Time
2018-09-25HouseIntroduced By Representative Edward Canfield

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-6379
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-6379.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-6379.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-6379.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-6379.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0357.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-09-26-064.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-03-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-11-08-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-11-08-071.htm

Bill Comments

feedback