MI HB6357 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 220'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 220'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement: public school employees; determination of payroll growth assumption for fiscal year 2023; cap. Amends sec. 41 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1341).
Title
Retirement: public school employees; determination of payroll growth assumption for fiscal year 2023; cap. Amends sec. 41 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1341).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 431 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 220'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2022 01:12 Pm |
2022-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/14/2022 11:58 Am |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2022 12:31 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 431 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-09-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-09-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2022 |
2022-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |