MI HB6348 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 616'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 616'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; personal property; distribution of local community stabilization act share revenues; modify. Amends sec. 17 of 2014 PA 86 (MCL 123.1357) & adds sec. 17a.
Title
Property tax; personal property; distribution of local community stabilization act share revenues; modify. Amends sec. 17 of 2014 PA 86 (MCL 123.1357) & adds sec. 17a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1008 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 868 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 626 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 868 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 626 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 616'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:44 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:15 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:54 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1008 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 868 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-10-04 | House | Transmitted |
2018-10-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 626 Yeas 102 Nays 4 |
2018-10-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-10-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/06/2018 |
2018-09-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-09-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |