MI HB6331 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 642'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Controlled substances; marihuana; definitions of industrial hemp and marihuana; modify. Amends sec. 7106 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7106).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; marihuana; definitions of industrial hemp and marihuana; modify. Amends sec. 7106 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7106).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1034 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 623 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 642'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:36 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 5:03 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 5:10 Pm
2018-12-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-21HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-21HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-21SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-21SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1034 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-21SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-21SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-12-05SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-12-05SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-05SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-11-08SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-10-04HouseTransmitted
2018-10-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 623 Yeas 106 Nays 0
2018-10-04HouseRead A Third Time
2018-10-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-10-03HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-10-03HouseRead A Second Time
2018-10-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-10-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-09-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/06/2018
2018-09-06HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2018-09-06HouseRead A First Time
2018-09-06HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-6331
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-6331.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-6331.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-6331.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-6331.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-03-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-04-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-05-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-21-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback