MI HB6233 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: vehicles; definition of sell and regulation of motor vehicle manufacturers; provide for and revise. Amends secs. 6, 14, 17 & 17a of 1981 PA 118 (MCL 445.1566 et seq.) & adds secs. 17c & 17d.
Title
Trade: vehicles; definition of sell and regulation of motor vehicle manufacturers; provide for and revise. Amends secs. 6, 14, 17 & 17a of 1981 PA 118 (MCL 445.1566 et seq.) & adds secs. 17c & 17d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 512 (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-02 | House | Title Amended |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 512 Yeas 65 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-02 | House | Substitute (h-4) Not Adopted |
2020-12-02 | House | Vote Reconsidered On Substitute (h-4) |
2020-12-02 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2020-12-02 | House | Amended |
2020-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended |
2020-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-2) Not Adopted |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-09-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/16/2020 |
2020-09-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-09-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |