MI HB6191 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection: retail installment sales; financing subscription services; allow. Amends secs. 2, 13 & 18 of 1950 (Ex Sess) PA 27 (MCL 492.102 et seq.).
Title
Consumer protection: retail installment sales; financing subscription services; allow. Amends secs. 2, 13 & 18 of 1950 (Ex Sess) PA 27 (MCL 492.102 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/09/2020 |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |