MI HB6122 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 615'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 615'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; solid waste; soil from sugar beet production; increase allowable moisture level. Amends sec. 11506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11506).
Title
Environmental protection; solid waste; soil from sugar beet production; increase allowable moisture level. Amends sec. 11506 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11506).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 929 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 649 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 649 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 615'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:42 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:13 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:54 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 929 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 649 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |