MI HB6111 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; other; eligibility requirements for certain licenses and registrations under the public health code; revise. Amends secs. 16104 & 21755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16104 & 333.21755). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6110'18
Title
Health occupations; other; eligibility requirements for certain licenses and registrations under the public health code; revise. Amends secs. 16104 & 21755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16104 & 333.21755). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6110'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 612 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 612 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2018-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 612 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2018-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Beth Griffin |
Subjects
Health occupations: health professionals
Health occupations: other
Health: occupations
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: other
Health: occupations
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs