MI HB6066 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting procedures; photo identification for voting purposes; define, and modify provisional ballot process. Amends secs. 523, 523a, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.523 et seq.).
Title
Elections; voting procedures; photo identification for voting purposes; define, and modify provisional ballot process. Amends secs. 523, 523a, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.523 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 595 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2016-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-07 | House | Title Amended |
2016-12-07 | House | Passed Roll Call # 595 Yeas 57 Nays 50 |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted And Amended |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2016-11-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/29/2016 |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2016-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Lisa Lyons |