MI HB6060 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 455'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; preliminary determination of eligibility of individuals who may apply for a license or registration; authorize in occupational code. Amends 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2677) by adding sec. 202a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; individual licensing and regulation; preliminary determination of eligibility of individuals who may apply for a license or registration; authorize in occupational code. Amends 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2677) by adding sec. 202a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 771 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 618 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28HouseAssigned Pa 455'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/21/2018 @ 3:36 Pm
2018-12-28HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2018 @ 4:40 Pm
2018-12-18HousePresented To The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:08 Pm
2018-12-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-12SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 771 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-12-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-12-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-11-08SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-10-03HouseTransmitted
2018-10-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 618 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2018-10-03HouseRead A Third Time
2018-10-03HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-10-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-10-03HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-10-03HouseRead A Second Time
2018-10-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-10-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-05-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2018
2018-05-23HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-05-23HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Lilly

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-6060
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-6060.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-6060.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-6060.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-6060.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0455.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-02-066.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-03-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-06-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-12-078.htm

Bill Comments

feedback