MI HB6015 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; pool of funds for distribution by the Michigan innovative transportation board to county or city road commissions to be used for innovative materials and construction projects; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 10s. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6013'18, HB 6014'18
Title
Transportation; funds; pool of funds for distribution by the Michigan innovative transportation board to county or city road commissions to be used for innovative materials and construction projects; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 10s. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6013'18, HB 6014'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 530 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 530 Yeas 99 Nays 10 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Noble |
Subjects
Highways: construction and repair
State agencies (existing): boards and commissions
State agencies (existing): transportation
Transportation: funds
State agencies (existing): boards and commissions
State agencies (existing): transportation
Transportation: funds