MI HB5982 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; preventing reporting of certain alleged crimes to title IX coordinator by use of position of authority; prohibit. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 478b.
Title
Crimes; other; preventing reporting of certain alleged crimes to title IX coordinator by use of position of authority; prohibit. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 478b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Sara Cambensy |