MI HB5960 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:16 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:16 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; home rule; authority of cities to impose licensing requirements on certain occupations; clarify and limit. Amends sec. 4i of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4i).
Title
Cities; home rule; authority of cities to impose licensing requirements on certain occupations; clarify and limit. Amends sec. 4i of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4i).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 891 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 780 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 (Y: 58 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 780 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 (Y: 58 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:16 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 498'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 5:06 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:49 Pm |
2018-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 891 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2018-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 780 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 466 Yeas 58 Nays 50 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/09/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-05-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Wentworth |