MI HB5926 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health benefits; Abortion Insurance Opt-Out Act; provide exception in case of rape or incest. Amends sec. 11 of 2013 PA 182 (MCL 550.551).
Title
Insurance; health benefits; Abortion Insurance Opt-Out Act; provide exception in case of rape or incest. Amends sec. 11 of 2013 PA 182 (MCL 550.551).
Sponsors
Rep. Gretchen Driskell [D] | Rep. Sarah Roberts [D] | Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Rep. David Nathan [D] |
Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014 |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Gretchen Driskell |
Same As/Similar To
SB1127 (Same As) 2014-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5926 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5926.htm |