MI HB5926 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 395'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 395'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; community revitalization program; clarify eligible investment definition, allow multiple applicants, and revise disbursement schedule. Amends secs. 90a, 90b, 90c & 90d of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a et seq.).
Title
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; community revitalization program; clarify eligible investment definition, allow multiple applicants, and revise disbursement schedule. Amends secs. 90a, 90b, 90c & 90d of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 922 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 661 (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 661 (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 395'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:46 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2012 @ 3:31 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2012 @ 4:54 Pm |
2012-12-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 922 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2012-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 661 Yeas 95 Nays 10 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-09-20 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/20/2012 |
2012-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradford Jacobsen |