MI HB5873 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 470'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; financial aid; administration of police officer's and fire fighter's survivor tuition act; transfer to department of treasury and revise application process. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4 & 5 of 1996 PA 195 (MCL 390.1241 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; financial aid; administration of police officer's and fire fighter's survivor tuition act; transfer to department of treasury and revise application process. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4 & 5 of 1996 PA 195 (MCL 390.1241 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 997 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 470'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:40 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:44 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27HousePresented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 3:04 Pm
2012-12-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-13HouseFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2012-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2012-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 997 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-12-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-09-20SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-09-19HouseTransmitted
2012-09-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 Yeas 104 Nays 0
2012-09-19HouseRead A Third Time
2012-09-19HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-09-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-09-19HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted And Amended
2012-09-19HouseRead A Second Time
2012-09-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-09-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-09-12HousePrinted Bill Filed 09/12/2012
2012-09-11HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-09-11HouseRead A First Time
2012-09-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Anthony Forlini

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5873
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0470.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-13-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-19-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback