MI HB5863 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 452'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Financial institutions; savings and loan associations; motor vehicle sales finance statute; revise citation to savings and loan act. Amends sec. 36 of 1950 (Ex Sess) PA 27 (MCL 492.136). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5835'12

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions; savings and loan associations; motor vehicle sales finance statute; revise citation to savings and loan act. Amends sec. 36 of 1950 (Ex Sess) PA 27 (MCL 492.136). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5835'12

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 844 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 898 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 584 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 452'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 10:23 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 9:28 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27HousePresented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:16 Am
2012-12-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-13HouseFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13House Roll Call # 844 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2012-12-13HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-12-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2012-12-12SenateInserted Full Title
2012-12-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 898 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2012-12-05SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-12-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-12-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-12-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-12-04SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-10-17SenateReferred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
2012-09-27HouseTransmitted
2012-09-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 584 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2012-09-27HouseRead A Third Time
2012-09-27HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-09-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-09-27HouseAmended
2012-09-27HouseRead A Second Time
2012-09-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-09-19HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-09-12HousePrinted Bill Filed 09/12/2012
2012-09-11HouseReferred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services
2012-09-11HouseRead A First Time
2012-09-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Ray Franz

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5863
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5863.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5863.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5863.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5863.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0452.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-19-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-27-071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-04-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback