MI HB5837 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 687'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 687'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; electric utilities; membership or associated membership in a joint agency; expand to another state or Canadian province under certain conditions. Amends 1976 PA 448 (MCL 460.801 - 460.848) by adding sec. 36a.
Title
Public utilities; electric utilities; membership or associated membership in a joint agency; expand to another state or Canadian province under certain conditions. Amends 1976 PA 448 (MCL 460.801 - 460.848) by adding sec. 36a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1041 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 687'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 8:06 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 6:23 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:24 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1041 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2018-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |