MI HB5822 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 527'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 527'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; purchasing; prohibition of contracting with certain discriminatory businesses; provide for. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 241c.
Title
State financing and management; purchasing; prohibition of contracting with certain discriminatory businesses; provide for. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 241c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 776 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 527'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 12:02 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 4:46 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:58 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 776 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 Yeas 97 Nays 10 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-09-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2016 |
2016-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |