MI HB5820 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 596'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health; code; procedure for involuntary mental health treatment and judicial admissions; revise. Amends subheading of ch. 5 & secs. 500, 501, 502, 503, 504, 505, 508, 509, 510, 511, 512, 515, 516, 517, 518, 519, 520, 521, 525, 526, 527, 528, 531, 532, 536, 537, 540 & 541 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1500 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; code; procedure for involuntary mental health treatment and judicial admissions; revise. Amends subheading of ch. 5 & secs. 500, 501, 502, 503, 504, 505, 508, 509, 510, 511, 512, 515, 516, 517, 518, 519, 520, 521, 525, 526, 527, 528, 531, 532, 536, 537, 540 & 541 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1500 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 862 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 596'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:04 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 3:41 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:24 Pm
2018-12-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-19HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-19HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-18SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-18SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 862 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-18SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-12-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-12-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-06-05SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-05-30HouseTransmitted
2018-05-30HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2018-05-30HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-29HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-29HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-16HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-04-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/17/2018
2018-04-17HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-04-17HouseRead A First Time
2018-04-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Klint Kesto

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5820
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5820.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5820.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5820.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5820.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-16-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-30-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-12-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-18-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback