MI HB5800 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; discipline; certain actions regarding pupil who reports being sexually assaulted; require, and prohibit pupil from being expelled for reported incident. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1310d.
Title
Education; discipline; certain actions regarding pupil who reports being sexually assaulted; require, and prohibit pupil from being expelled for reported incident. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1310d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-29 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 98 Nays 10 |
2018-05-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Yousef Rabhi |