MI HB5749 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 377'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 377'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; vehicle platooning operations; exempt from requirement that trucks and truck tractors leave sufficient space between themselves and other trucks or truck tractors for overtaking vehicles. Amends sec. 643a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.643a).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; vehicle platooning operations; exempt from requirement that trucks and truck tractors leave sufficient space between themselves and other trucks or truck tractors for overtaking vehicles. Amends sec. 643a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.643a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 755 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Assigned Pa 377'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2018 @ 3:08 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 10:42 Am |
2018-12-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/14/2018 @ 1:42 Pm |
2018-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 755 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-05-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 Yeas 64 Nays 44 |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Webber |