MI HB5694 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 365'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 365'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; discipline; requirement for mandatory expulsion for assault on another pupil; modify. Amends sec. 1310 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1310).
Title
Education; discipline; requirement for mandatory expulsion for assault on another pupil; modify. Amends sec. 1310 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1310).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 739 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 365'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2016 @ 11:04 Am |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:58 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 11:14 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 739 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-06-02 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-05-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-25 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |