MI HB5672 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
Pending: Senate Economic And Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights: employment discrimination; implantation of devices into the bodies of employees; prohibit as a condition of employment. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: employment discrimination; implantation of devices into the bodies of employees; prohibit as a condition of employment. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2020-06-24HouseTransmitted
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-24HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-06-17HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-03-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/25/2020
2020-03-17HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2020-03-17HouseRead A First Time
2020-03-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Bronna Kahle

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback