MI HB5655 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; benefits; disqualification from receiving benefits when leaving employment; create exception for domestic violence victim. Amends secs. 17 & 29 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.17 & 421.29) & adds sec. 29a.
Title
Employment security; benefits; disqualification from receiving benefits when leaving employment; create exception for domestic violence victim. Amends secs. 17 & 29 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.17 & 421.29) & adds sec. 29a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-02 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-06-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Irwin |