MI HB5641 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 269'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 269'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; personal protection orders; orders for transfer of wireless telephone numbers; allow issuance of. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 2950n. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5642'16
Title
Civil procedure; personal protection orders; orders for transfer of wireless telephone numbers; allow issuance of. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 2950n. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5642'16
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] | Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Vanessa Guerra [D] | Rep. Fred Durhal [D] |
Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Assigned Pa 269'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/1/2016 @ 9:29 Am |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/29/2016 @ 4:49 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2016 @ 10:56 Am |
2016-06-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-06-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 446 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-02 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-05-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/11/2016 |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2016-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |
Subjects
Civil procedure: personal protection orders
Communications: cellular telephone
Family law: domestic violence
Communications: cellular telephone
Family law: domestic violence