MI HB5639 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 680'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; title; assembled vehicles; require secretary of state to issue a vehicle identification number and title under certain circumstances. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 217i.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; title; assembled vehicles; require secretary of state to issue a vehicle identification number and title under certain circumstances. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 217i.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 972 (Y: 64 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1025 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 680 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 680'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 7:52 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 6:13 Pm
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:14 Pm
2018-12-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-20HouseSenate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 972 Yeas 64 Nays 43
2018-12-20HouseRule Suspended
2018-12-20HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-12-20HouseReturned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-20SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-20SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1025 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-20SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-20SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
2018-12-20SenateAmendment(s) Concurred In
2018-12-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
2018-12-20SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2018-12-20SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2018-12-06SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2018-12-05HouseTransmitted
2018-12-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 680 Yeas 63 Nays 45
2018-12-05HouseRead A Third Time
2018-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-12-04HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-01HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-01HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-02-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/27/2018
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2018-02-27HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Brett Roberts

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5639
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5639.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5639.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5639.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5639.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-01-042.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-05-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-20-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-20-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback