MI HB5530 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; electric utilities; definition of independent transmission company; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1923 PA 238 (MCL 486.255).
Title
Public utilities; electric utilities; definition of independent transmission company; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1923 PA 238 (MCL 486.255).
Sponsors
Rep. Triston Cole [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Sen. James Runestad [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Rep. Aaron Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2016-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Same As) 2016-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology
Subjects
Public utilities: electric utilities
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5530 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5530.htm |