MI HB5501 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-19 - Assigned Pa 305'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-19 - Assigned Pa 305'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; peace officers; reference to peace officer certification under the Michigan commission on law enforcement standards act in the large carnivore act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1102).
Title
Law enforcement; peace officers; reference to peace officer certification under the Michigan commission on law enforcement standards act in the large carnivore act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1102).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-19 | House | Assigned Pa 305'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-10-19 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/4/2016 @ 3:16 Pm |
2016-10-19 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/3/2016 @ 8:50 Pm |
2016-10-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 9/28/2016 @ 4:16 Pm |
2016-09-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-09-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-09-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 489 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2016-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Kathy Crawford |