MI HB5493 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Assigned Pa 180'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Assigned Pa 180'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management: audits; quarterly report on executive branch and enterprisewide information technology projects; require the department of technology, management, and budget to provide. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 490.
Title
State financing and management: audits; quarterly report on executive branch and enterprisewide information technology projects; require the department of technology, management, and budget to provide. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 490.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] | Sen. Mark Huizenga [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Annette Glenn [R] |
Rep. Abdullah Hammoud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 391 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Assigned Pa 180'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2020 12:16 Pm |
2020-10-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/08/2020 11:04 Am |
2020-09-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/24/2020 12:56 Pm |
2020-09-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 391 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-22 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/19/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |