MI HB5487 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Human services; medical services; universal Medicaid credentialing process; create. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 111m.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services; medical services; universal Medicaid credentialing process; create. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 111m.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-03-22HouseTransmitted
2018-03-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-03-22HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2018-03-21HouseRead A Second Time
2018-03-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-01-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/30/2018
2018-01-30HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-01-30HouseRead A First Time
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced By Representative Edward Canfield

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback