MI HB5448 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 152'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Businesses: business corporations; educational corporation; allow to reopen under certain conditions. Amends sec. 171 of 1931 PA 327 (MCL 450.171). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5447'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Businesses: business corporations; educational corporation; allow to reopen under certain conditions. Amends sec. 171 of 1931 PA 327 (MCL 450.171). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5447'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 609 (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 480 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 554 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15HouseAssigned Pa 152'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:38 Pm
2021-12-15HouseApproved By The Governor 12/23/2021 10:26 Am
2021-12-15HousePresented To The Governor 12/17/2021 11:22 Am
2021-12-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-12-14HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 609 Yeas 101 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-12-14HouseSenate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
2021-12-09HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-12-09HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-2)
2021-12-09SenatePassed Roll Call # 480 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-12-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2021-12-08SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2021-12-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-12-01SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-12-01SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-11-30SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2021-11-10HouseTransmitted
2021-11-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 554 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-11-10HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-09HouseRead A Second Time
2021-10-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-10-21HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/20/2021
2021-10-20HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2021-10-20HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5448
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5448.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5448.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-5448.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-5448.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0152.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5448-00C717.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5447-6815C499.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5447-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5447-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5447-B.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5447-D1C44D44.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-26-088.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-10-095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-01-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-09-098.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-14-102.htm

Bill Comments

feedback