MI HB5428 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/20/2021
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/20/2021
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: judges; number of judgeships in certain circuit courts; increase by 1 effective January 1, 2023. Amends secs. 515 & 521 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.515 & 600.521).
Title
Courts: judges; number of judgeships in certain circuit courts; increase by 1 effective January 1, 2023. Amends secs. 515 & 521 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.515 & 600.521).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-10-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |