MI HB5428 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; deductions; contributions made to enhanced Michigan education savings accounts; provide for. Amends secs. 30 & 30f of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.30f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0544'17
Title
Individual income tax; deductions; contributions made to enhanced Michigan education savings accounts; provide for. Amends secs. 30 & 30f of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 & 206.30f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0544'17
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/17/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Kelly |
Subjects
Education: financing
Higher education: tuition
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: other
Higher education: tuition
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: other