MI HB5421 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; surveillance; exemption to the prohibition of recording a private conversation to allow a homeowner to conduct both audio and video recordings in his or her home under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends sec. 539c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.539c).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; surveillance; exemption to the prohibition of recording a private conversation to allow a homeowner to conduct both audio and video recordings in his or her home under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends sec. 539c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.539c).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 129 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-03-03HouseTransmitted
2020-03-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 129 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-03-03HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-26HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-02-26HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-18HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-18HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020
2020-01-28HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-01-28HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Graham Filler

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback