MI HB5421 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Reassigned To Committee On Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Reassigned To Committee On Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; city; treatment of exemptions after reduction of federal exemptions to zero; clarify. Amends secs. 31 & 44, ch. 2 of 1964 PA 284 (MCL 141.631 & 141.644). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5420'18, HB 5422'18
Title
Individual income tax; city; treatment of exemptions after reduction of federal exemptions to zero; clarify. Amends secs. 31 & 44, ch. 2 of 1964 PA 284 (MCL 141.631 & 141.644). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5420'18, HB 5422'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 21 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 21 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-01-25 | House | Transmitted |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 21 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-01-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Noble |
Subjects
Cities: income tax
Individual income tax: city
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: exemptions
Individual income tax: city
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: exemptions