MI HB5402 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Assigned Pa 343'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; evidence; videorecorded statements used for training purposes; require consent of certain individuals, and allow to be used in counties other than the county in which the videorecorded statement was taken. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; evidence; videorecorded statements used for training purposes; require consent of certain individuals, and allow to be used in counties other than the county in which the videorecorded statement was taken. Amends sec. 2163a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2163a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 587 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 574 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseAssigned Pa 343'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-10-17HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/16/2018 @ 1:36 Pm
2018-10-17HouseApproved By The Governor 10/16/2018 @ 8:52 Am
2018-10-04HousePresented To The Governor 10/4/2018 @ 9:58 Am
2018-10-02HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-10-02HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-10-02House Roll Call # 587 Yeas 104 Nays 2
2018-10-02HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-09-27HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-09-27HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-09-26SenateInserted Full Title
2018-09-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 574 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-09-26SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-09-26SenateRules Suspended
2018-09-26SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-09-26SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-09-26SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-02SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-02SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-13SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-03-08HouseTransmitted
2018-03-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 105 Nays 2
2018-03-08HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-07HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2018-03-07HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2018-01-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/11/2018
2018-01-11HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-01-11HouseRead A First Time
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Diana Farrington

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5402
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5402.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5402.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-09-26-066.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-02-066.htm

Bill Comments

feedback