MI HB5401 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Assigned Pa 70'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Watercraft; traffic control; temporary speed restrictions during high water conditions; provide for. Amends sec. 80146 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.80146). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5463'19, HB 5402'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watercraft; traffic control; temporary speed restrictions during high water conditions; provide for. Amends sec. 80146 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.80146). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5463'19, HB 5402'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 187 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseAssigned Pa 70'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-03-25HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 09:50 Am
2020-03-25HouseApproved By The Governor 04/02/2020 08:38 Am
2020-03-25HousePresented To The Governor 03/19/2020 01:14 Pm
2020-03-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-03-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-03-17HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 187 Yeas 93 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 17
2020-03-17HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-03-17HouseRule Suspended
2020-03-17HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-03-17HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-03-17SenateInserted Full Title
2020-03-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-03-17SenateRules Suspended
2020-03-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-03-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-03-17SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-03-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-03-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-03-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2020-02-25HouseTransmitted
2020-02-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-02-25HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-25HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-02-25HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-25HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2020-02-25HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-25HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2020-02-11HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2020
2020-01-23HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2020-01-23HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Gary Eisen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5401
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5401.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-5401.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-5401.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-5401.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-02-25-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-03-12-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-03-17-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-17-029.htm

Bill Comments

feedback