MI HB5369 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; other; street cars; modify motor vehicle code to provide for. Amends secs. 42, 46, 48, 49, 63, 69, 618a, 634, 660, 660a, 660d, 673, 674, 675d & 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.42 et seq.) & adds secs. 63a, 64a, 64b & ch. VIA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; other; street cars; modify motor vehicle code to provide for. Amends secs. 42, 46, 48, 49, 63, 69, 618a, 634, 660, 660a, 660d, 673, 674, 675d & 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.42 et seq.) & adds secs. 63a, 64a, 64b & ch. VIA.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-05-13HouseTransmitted
2020-05-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 102 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-05-13HouseRead A Third Time
2020-05-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-05-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-05-13HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-05-13HouseRead A Second Time
2020-05-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-05-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-22HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/22/2020
2020-01-21HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-01-21HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Graham Filler

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback