MI HB5367 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 518'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; multidepartment supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2012-2013. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; multidepartment supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2012-2013. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 889 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1004 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 663 (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 518'12 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:48 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:24 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:26 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-14House Roll Call # 889 Yeas 106 Nays 0
2012-12-14HouseSenate Substitute S-2 Concurred In
2012-12-13HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-13HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1004 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2012-12-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-13SenateRules Suspended
2012-12-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended
2012-12-13SenateSubstitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In
2012-12-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s)
2012-12-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2012-12-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-12-04SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-11-29HouseTransmitted
2012-11-29HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 663 Yeas 61 Nays 45
2012-11-29HouseRead A Third Time
2012-11-29HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-11-29HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-11-29HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-29HousePlaced On Second Reading
2012-11-29HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2012-11-29HouseRule Suspended
2012-02-08HousePrinted Bill Filed 02/08/2012
2012-02-07HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-02-07HouseRead A First Time
2012-02-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Chuck Moss

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5367
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5367.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5367.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5367.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5367.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0518.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-29-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback