MI HB5313 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 103'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; registration; electric vehicle registration fees; revise. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5195'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; registration; electric vehicle registration fees; revise. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5195'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 246 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 166 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21HouseAssigned Pa 103'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-07-21HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:00 Pm
2020-07-21HouseApproved By The Governor 07/01/2020 10:12 Am
2020-07-21HousePresented To The Governor 06/23/2020 10:36 Am
2020-06-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-06-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-06-17HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 246 Yeas 82 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-17HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-06-10HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-06-10HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-06-10SenateInserted Full Title
2020-06-10SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 166 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-06-09SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-09SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-06-09SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-04SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-01-28SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2020-01-23HouseTransmitted
2020-01-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-01-23HouseRead A Third Time
2020-01-22HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-01-22HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended
2020-01-22HouseRead A Second Time
2020-01-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-01-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-14HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/14/2020
2020-01-09HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2020-01-09HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Jason Sheppard

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5313
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0103.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-01-14-003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-01-23-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-04-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-10-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-17-055.htm

Bill Comments

feedback