MI HB5313 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 507'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation; funds; conditions to receive funding from Michigan transportation fund; modify. Amends 1973 PA 139 (MCL 45.551 - 45.573) by adding sec. 4a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; funds; conditions to receive funding from Michigan transportation fund; modify. Amends 1973 PA 139 (MCL 45.551 - 45.573) by adding sec. 4a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 835 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 892 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 507'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:26 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:20 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:22 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-13House Roll Call # 835 Yeas 65 Nays 44
2012-12-13HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-12-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 892 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-05SenateRules Suspended
2012-12-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2012-12-05SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-12-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-29SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-06-12SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2012-06-07HouseTransmitted
2012-06-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 64 Nays 44
2012-06-07HouseRead A Third Time
2012-06-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-06-06HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted
2012-06-06HouseRead A Second Time
2012-05-30HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-05-30HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4
2012-01-31HousePrinted Bill Filed 01/27/2012
2012-01-26HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2012-01-26HouseRead A First Time
2012-01-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Bradford Jacobsen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5313
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5313.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0507.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-05-30-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-06-07-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback