MI HB5274 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 85'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 85'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; gas and oil; regulations for carbon dioxide pipelines; provide for. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 4 & 5 of 1929 PA 16 (MCL 483.1 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4885'13, HB 5254'14, HB 5255'14
Title
Natural resources; gas and oil; regulations for carbon dioxide pipelines; provide for. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 4 & 5 of 1929 PA 16 (MCL 483.1 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4885'13, HB 5254'14, HB 5255'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 132 (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 132 (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 132 (Y: 96 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Assigned Pa 85'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-04-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/1/2014 @ 1:36 Pm |
2014-04-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/1/2014 @ 8:23 Am |
2014-03-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:16 Pm |
2014-03-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-20 | House | Roll Call # 132 Yeas 96 Nays 14 |
2014-03-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2014-02-13 | House | Transmitted |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 Yeas 99 Nays 11 |
2014-02-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-02-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/31/2014 |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2014-01-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |